Syme, Roderick Glanville (CPSO#: 32695)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Syme Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 212 2039 Robertson Road Ottawa ON K2H 8R2
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016