Szabo, Michael Stephen (CPSO#: 67781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto, ON M5G 2C4
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3946
Fax: (416) 340-4300
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

460 Richmond St. W.
Suite 100
Toronto ON  M5V 1Y1
Canada
Phone: 416-730-8488
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Szabo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Szabo ( CPSO# 67781 )

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5190

Business Address:
University Health Network
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3946

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL STEPHEN SZABO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZABO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996