Szakacs, Thomas Attila (CPSO#: 77614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
Microbiology Laboratory
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544 Ext. 2660
Fax: (519) 752-7809
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

13293 Yonge St., Suite 403
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: 905-773-3884
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas A. Szakacs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Szakacs ( CPSO# 77614 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
Microbiology Laboratory
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
403 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-3884

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS ATTILA SZAKACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZAKACS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006