Szaky, Esther Aurelia (CPSO#: 62673)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Harding Boulevard
Suite 205
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 508-5911
Fax: (905) 508-2972
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Szaky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Szaky ( CPSO# 62673 )

Business Address:
205 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 508-5911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 06 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESTHER AURELIA SZAKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZAKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1991