Szalay, David Anthony (CPSO#: 64055)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 1992


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44644
Fax: (905) 521-0440
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2035 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7S2
Phone: (905) 815-0999
Fax: (905) 815-0997
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David A. Szalay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2007

Dr. D. Szalay ( CPSO# 64055 )

Business Address:
Suite 5N - 504
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
2035 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7S2
Phone Number: (905) 815-0999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton


Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. DAVID ANTHONY SZALAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZALAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1992