Szecket, Nicolas (CPSO#: 72525)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Szecket & Dr. Michelle Wise Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 1 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2010