Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Szendrey, James Joseph (CPSO#: 59577)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Brock Street North
Whitby ON  L1N 4H5
Phone: (905) 668-3378
Fax: (905) 668-3807
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Szendrey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Szendrey ( CPSO# 59577 )

Business Address:
200 Brock Street North
Whitby ON  L1N 4H5
Phone Number: (905) 668-3378

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES JOSEPH SZENDREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZENDREY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1989