Szentgyorgyi, Eva Maria (CPSO#: 42381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Apr 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
University Health Network-TGH Site
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5203
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Life Labs
100 International Blvd
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Canada
Phone: (416) 675-4530
Fax: (416) 213-4206
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 22 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVA MARIA SZENTGYORGYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZENTGYORGYI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1990