Szeto, Christopher Chung Tek (CPSO#: 89954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Otolaryngology
Head and Neck Surgery
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 222-6445
Fax: (705) 222-6447
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

845 Regent Street
Suite 101
Sudbury ON  P3E 4T3
Canada
Phone: (705) 222-6445
Fax: (705) 222-6447
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher C. T. Szeto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Szeto ( CPSO# 89954 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
845 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 4T3
Phone Number: (705) 222-6445

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Otolaryngology
Head and Neck Surgery
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 673-6836

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CHUNG TEK SZETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZETO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Oct 2008 to 02 Nov 2008
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2010