Szlanta, Agata (CPSO#: 87343)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900 Ext. 53257
Fax: (613) 544-4017
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Agata Szlanta Medecine Societe Professionelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Szlanta ( CPSO# 87343 )

Business Address:
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AGATA SZLANTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZLANTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2009