Szmuilowicz, Sharon (CPSO#: 81050)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
600 University Avenue
Room 937
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5348
Fax: (416) 586-8654
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Szmuilowicz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Szmuilowicz ( CPSO# 81050 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
600 University Avenue
9th Floor, Room 937
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON SZMUILOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZMUILOWICZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2010