Szozda, Timothy James Peter (CPSO#: 57112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
564 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 200
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 742-2046
Fax: (519) 742-3607
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. J. Szozda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Szozda ( CPSO# 57112 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 742-2046

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JAMES PETER SZOZDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZOZDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1988
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1988

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Szozda’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Szozda sexually abused Patient A, and engaged disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards Patient A in approximately 2013 and 2014, including by breaching boundaries, and making inappropriate remarks and remarks of a sexual nature towards Patient A. In addition, Dr. Szozda failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession with respect to Patient A in the conduct of examinations in approximately 2013 and 2014.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)