Szpejda, Witold Jozef (CPSO#: 53002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health Systems
St.Catharines General Hospital
1200 4th Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-7271 Ext. 45561
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglington Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-3946
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Witold Szpejda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Szpejda ( CPSO# 53002 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-3946

Business Address:
Niagara Health Systems
St. Catharine's General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WITOLD JOZEF SZPEJDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZPEJDA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1985