Szpindel, Isaac Ichak Eizek (CPSO#: 66287)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
32 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N4
Phone: (416) 598-9344
Fax: (416) 598-8198
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Freedman Szpindel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Freedman ( CPSO# 69723 )
Dr. I. Szpindel ( CPSO# 66287 )

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Centre York University
4700 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 1P3
Phone Number: (416) 479-8649

Business Address:
Start Clinic for Mood and Anxiety Disorders
32 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N4
Phone Number: (416) 598-9344

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISAAC ICHAK EIZEK SZPINDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZPINDEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Apr 1993 to 02 May 1993
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1993