Sztukowski, Izabela (CPSO#: 80120)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2003 to 19 Sep 2003
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2004 to 19 Sep 2004
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2004