Szul, John Michael (CPSO#: 46641)

Current Status: Active Member - CPSO Staff as of 08 Sep 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ukrainian Canadian Care Centre
60 Richview Rd
Toronto ON M9A 5E4
Toronto ON  M5G 2E2
Phone: 416-243-7653
Fax: 4162437452
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ukrainian Canadian Care Centre
60 Richview Road
Toronto ON  M9A 5E4
Canada
Phone: (416) 243-7653
Fax: (416) 243-7452
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Czemerynski-Szul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Szul ( CPSO# 46641 )
Dr. A. Czemerynski ( CPSO# 56183 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5

Business Address:
Ukrainian Canadian Care Centre
60 Richview Road
Toronto ON  M9A 5E4
Phone Number: (416) 243-7653

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MICHAEL SZUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZUL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1987