Szulewski, Adam (CPSO#: 93213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Empire 3
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Szulewski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Szulewski ( CPSO# 93213 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Empire 3
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stewart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Kingston Health Sciences-HDH Site
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM SZULEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZULEWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015