Szumacher, Ewa Franciszka (CPSO#: 67360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue North
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6000 Ext. 2802
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ewa Szumacher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Szumacher ( CPSO# 67360 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4982

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 23 Jul 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EWA FRANCISZKA SZUMACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZUMACHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 23 Jul 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1997