Szumski, Roman George (CPSO#: 54414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
National Research Council
100 Sussex Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0R6
Phone: (613) 993-9244
Fax: (613) 954-2066
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROMAN GEORGE SZUMSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZUMSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1985