Ta, Hien Minh (CPSO#: 64123)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Dalhousie University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MacKenzie Health, Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 2110
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 204
5460 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Canada
Phone: (416) 250-7171
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hien Ta, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ta ( CPSO# 64123 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
5460 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Phone Number: (416) 250-7171

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HIEN MINH TA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1992