Ta-Min, Wee Foh (CPSO#: 23464)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Oct 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: Tai-Min, Wee Foh (used until: 22 Mar 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:University of Leeds, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Oct 1995