Taam, Lindsay (CPSO#: 91468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia, 1SE-157
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000 Ext. 6520
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lindsay Taam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Taam ( CPSO# 91468 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia, 1SE-157
1st Floor Operating Rooms
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 27 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSAY TAAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015