Tabbakh, Jean Noel Elias (CPSO#: 44100)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2001