Tabet Almeida, Janine (CPSO#: 73071)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Valencia, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Oct 1999
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1999