Tabl, Samar (CPSO#: 99832)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2013 to 03 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 05 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015