Tadros, Cherif (CPSO#: 63215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rockland M D
Suite 115
100 Rockland
Montreal QC  H3P 2V9
Phone: (514) 667-3383 Ext. 250
Fax: (514) 664-1976

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERIF TADROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TADROS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1990