Tadros, Sharif (CPSO#: 53246)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 06 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 May 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Phone: (416) 781-9083 or 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 02 Dec 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2014
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 08 Nov 2014
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 06 May 2015

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 May 2015
Summary:

 On May 6, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Tadros committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of patients; that he has engaged 
 in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional; and that he contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of 
 registration. Dr. Tadros admitted to the allegations. 
  
 Patient A 
 Patient A became Dr. Tadros’ patient in 2009. She went to see him for botox/filler injections. 
After inviting Patient A for a complimentary touch up on the week-end when no one was in the 
office, Dr. Tadros initiated sexual contact with her, while giving her injections, by pressing his 
groin into the side of her body, and then kissing her. Dr. Tadros asked Patient A to come back 
the next evening and they had sexual intercourse and oral sex in Dr. Tadros’ office. Dr. Tadros 
and Patient A continued a sexual relationship, including sexual intercourse and oral sex, for well 
over a year. Dr. Tadros regularly contacted Patient A by telephone and exchanged sexually 
explicit text messages with her. Dr. Tadros would regularly administer botox/fillers to Patient A 
after they finished having sexual intercourse and oral sex. Patient A did not pay Dr. Tadros 
money for these injections.  
 
Dr. Tadros failed to cooperate with the College investigation related to Patient A including: 
•  Dr. Tadros repeatedly failed to produce Patient A’s chart despite repeated requests 
•  Ultimately, Dr. Tadros provided a falsified chart (indicating that the money Patient A had 
   paid for botox/fillers was for cosmetics she purchased at the clinic) in order to mislead the 
   College and support his false assertion that Patient A was never his patient.  
•  Dr. Tadros provided information to the College knowing it was false including that Patient A 
   only bought cosmetic products from his assistant, that he did not treat Patient, that he could 
   not transcribe her chart because it was written by his cosmetician, and in response to requests 
   from the College for Patient A’s original chart (rather than a photocopy), Dr. Tadros said that 
   he could not find Patient A’s original chart, that it must have been misplaced, and reiterated 
   that Patient A had purchased products. 
•  Dr. Tadros also had his staff provide information to the College that he knew to be false in 
   order to mislead the College in its investigation of Patient A’s complaint. 

Dr. Tadros threatened Patient A and pressured her into sending an email and a letter to the 
College investigator stating that Dr. Tadros was not her physician at any time, and requesting, in 
the email that her complaint be withdrawn.  
 
Patient B 
Patient B became a patient of Dr. Tadros’ in 1989, along with her children and husband. Dr. 
Tadros treated Patient B for various medical issues and ailments between 1989 and 2012, 
including anxiety and depression. A few years after Patient B became Dr. Tadros’ patient, Dr. 
Tadros began to compliment Patient B, and mentioned that he might be able to offer her a job in 
his office as a secretary. On one of Patient B’s appointments with Dr. Tadros, he told her that she 
seemed down, and asked her to come back to his office that evening when he would have more 
time to spend with her to discuss her feeling down. On a subsequent after-hours visit to his 
office, Dr. Tadros initiated sexual contact with Patient B and had sexual intercourse with her in 
his office. The sexual relationship between Dr. Tadros and Patient B continued for many years, 
mostly at his office after hours, while Dr. Tadros continued to provide regular care and treatment 
to Patient B, her husband and their children. Patient B’s husband found out about Dr. Tadros’ 
sexual relationship with Patient B when he overheard Dr. Tadros and Patient B on the phone. Dr. 
Tadros denied the relationship when Patient B’s husband confronted him. 
 
In his response to the College, Dr. Tadros denied having a sexual relationship with Patient B 
while she was his patient. He told the College, among other things, that he had a relationship 
with Patient B prior to her becoming his patient, that Patient B had tried to harass him into 
restarting the relationship, that Patient B and her husband were “creating an issue to discredit” 
him. Dr. Tadros provided this information to the College knowing it was false, in order to try to 
discredit Patient B and her husband and to mislead the College in its investigation. 
 
Dr. Tadros’ assistant wrote a letter to the College which stated that Patient B told her that her 
relationship with Dr. Tadros started and ended before Patient B became his patient, and that 
although Patient B wished to re-start the relationship, Dr. Tadros “totally refused.” Dr. Tadros 
provided this information to the College knowing that it was false, in order to mislead the 
College in its investigation.  
 
During its investigation, the College requested that Dr. Tadros transcribe his medical record for 
Patient B, as it was illegible. The transcription omitted many entries in Patient B’s medical 
record. 
 
Patient C 
Patient C became Dr. Tadros’ patient in 1997, along with one of her children. From 1997 until 
2014, Dr. Tadros was Patient C’s family physician and that of her children. Dr. Tadros also 
occasionally provided care to Patient C’s husband. Dr. Tadros treated Patient C for anxiety, 
panic attacks and depression as well as various other medical issues.  
 
In approximately 2006, Dr. Tadros suggested that Patient C come to his office at the end of the 
day for botox injections. That evening, Dr. Tadros initiated sexual contact with Patient C, and 
had sexual intercourse with her in his office. The sexual relationship between Dr. Tadros and 
Patient C continued for many years (until approximately 2012) and included sexual intercourse 
and oral sex. Dr. Tadros would often call Patient C and ask her to come to the office, where they 
would have sexual intercourse and oral sex in Dr. Tadros’ back room or rehabilitation room. On 
occasion, after they had sexual intercourse, Dr. Tadros would inject Patient C with botox. She 
did not pay him money for these injections. 
 
Contravened Terms, Conditions and Limitations on Certificate of Registration 
On July 15, 2014, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) of the College 
made an order under s.37 of the Health Professions Procedural Code and directed the Registrar to 
impose terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Tadros’ certificate of registration, including that 
Dr. Tadros shall not engage in any professional encounter or interaction with any female person, 
except in the presence of a monitor. 
 
Dr. Tadros failed to comply with the terms of the s.37 Order by, among other things, repeatedly 
having professional encounters and interactions with female patients without a monitor, failing to 
comply with the requirements of the Order regarding posting a sign, failing to maintain a log and 
failing to submit to and not interfere with unannounced inspections of his office and practice by 
the College for the purposes of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of the 
s.37 Order.   
 
As a result of information received by the ICRC regarding Dr. Tadros’ breach of the s.37 Order, 
on September 16, 2014, the ICRC varied the terms of the s.37 Order. One of the conditions was 
that Dr. Tadros shall not engage in any professional encounter or interaction with any female 
person. 
 
Dr. Tadros breached the terms of the s.37 Order, varied on September 16, 2014, by continuing to 
have professional encounters and interactions with multiple female patients. Examples of this 
include, but are not limited to, Dr. Tadros performing botox/filler injections on multiple female 
patients at a medical spa when he was prohibited from treating female patients. Dr. Tadros never 
advised the owners of that medical spa of the terms of s.37 Order made July 15, 2014 or the 
terms of the s.37 Order as varied on September 16, 2014, nor did he ever post a sign at this 
practice location. 
 
On November 7, 2014, as a result of information received by the ICRC regarding Dr. Tadros’ 
breach of the s. 37 Order of September 16, 2014, the ICRC further varied the terms of the s. 37 
Order, directing the Registrar to suspend Dr. Tadros’ certificate of registration effective 12:01 
a.m. November 8, 2014. 
 
On May 6, 2015, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
   •  the Registrar revoke Dr. Tadros’ certificate of registration effective immediately.  
   •  Dr. Tadros appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
   •  Dr. Tadros reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program 
      required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other 
      security acceptable to the College, by June 30, 2015, in the amount of $48,100. 
   •  Dr. Tadros pay costs to the College in the amount of $31,510.00, by June 30, 2015. 
       

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 4. Adjourned to May 6, 2015


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Oct 2010
Summary:

 On October 25, 2010, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Tadros' admission and found that Dr. 
 Tadros committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to respond appropriately or 
 within a reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College (by not providing transcriptions of 
 his patient charts in a timely manner in the context of a section 75(a) investigation into his 
 practice).

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	Dr. Tadros appear before the 
 panel to be reprimanded.

2.	Dr. Tadros pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00, 
 within 60 days of the date of this Order; and

3.	The results of this proceeding to be included on 
 the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 25, 2010


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Apr 1990
Summary:

 In April 1990, Dr. Tadros pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant 
 to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
 regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Discipline Committee 
 accepted this plea and found Dr. Tadros guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the 
 Committee imposed the following penalty:

1.	Dr. Tadros was to be reprimanded, with the fact of 
 the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2.	Dr. Tadros( licence to practice was to be 
 suspended for a period of three months.

3.	Dr. Tadros( licence to practice was to be suspended 
 for a further period of nine months, the imposition of which penalty was itself to be suspended, 
 on the following terms:

(i)	that Dr. Tadros undergo treatment for his addiction by his treating 
 physician or another physician acceptable to the Registrar for a period of two years from the date 
 upon which this Order became final; and

(ii)	that Dr. Tadros( current physician, or such 
 physician as might replace him, provide to the Registrar on a quarterly basis a report of Dr. 
 Tadros( continuing treatment and indicating the nature of the treatment for addiction.

In the 
 event that either of these terms was not met in the opinion of the Registrar, then the penalty of 
 nine months additional suspension was to be served by Dr. Tadros.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 29 Nov 1991
Hearing Date(s): 27 Apr 1990