Tadross, Latif Aziz Abdel Sayed (CPSO#: 55272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6440 Ext. 2880
Fax: (519) 837-6461
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tadross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tadross ( CPSO# 55272 )
Dr. O. Boutross-Tadross ( CPSO# 64695 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Health Sciences Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 14 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LATIF AZIZ ABDEL SAYED TADROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TADROSS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1990