Tadwalkar, Sayali (CPSO#: 92590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Marathi

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Marathon Family Health Team
22 Peninsula Road
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone: (807) 229-3243
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Tadwalkar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tadwalkar ( CPSO# 92590 )

Business Address:
Family Health Team
22 Peninsula Road
PO Box 399
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone Number: (807) 229-3242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAYALI TADWALKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TADWALKAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Mar 2010 to 09 Apr 2010
Elective Trainee - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010