Taghavi, Reza (CPSO#: 95213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Islamic Azad University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cassandra Clinic
2048 Victoria Park Ave
Scarborough ON  M1R 1V4
Phone: 4163319111
Fax: 416 331 9050
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Iran

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Aug 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 24 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REZA TAGHAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAGHAVI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 26 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 26 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 25 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 25 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015