Taguchi, Nobuko (CPSO#: 81919)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Medical University of Tokyo, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 09 Nov 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 10 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 23 Mar 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008