Taha, Monir (CPSO#: 58045)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Apr 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Apr 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
City of Ottawa
Ottawa Public Health
100 Constellation Drive
7th Floor West
Ottawa ON  K2G 6J8
Phone: 613-580-6744 Ext. 23684
Fax: 613-580-9641
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIR TAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1999