Taheri-Anaraki, Atousa (CPSO#: 88092)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301 High Tech Rd
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 4R2
Phone: (905) 709-4985
Fax: (905) 709-4985
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

700-200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9L3
Canada
Phone: (905) 856-2100
Fax: (905) 856-2102
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

3609 Sheppard Avenue E, Unit 202 Sc
Toronto ON  M1T 3K8
Canada
Phone: 416 321 2643
Fax: 416.321.5006
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

245 Ellington Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3B7
Canada
Phone: (416) 488-1455
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Atousa Taheri-Anaraki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Taheri-Anaraki ( CPSO# 88092 )

Business Address:
200 Windflower Gate
Suite 700
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9L3

Business Address:
301 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 4R2
Phone Number: (905) 709-4985

Business Address:
800 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 7L2
Phone Number: (905) 738-6699

Business Address:
202 - 3609 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3K8
Phone Number: (416) 321-2643

Business Address:
245 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 488-1455

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Feb 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATOUSA TAHERI-ANARAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHERI-ANARAKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2008 to 23 May 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 May 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2010