Taherzadeh, Shamim (CPSO#: 104673)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: Taherzadeh-Malmiri, Shamim (used until: 02 Feb 2015 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Meadowlands Family Health Centre
888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa ON  K2C 3R2
Phone: (613) 228-2882
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shamim Taherzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Taherzadeh ( CPSO# 104673)

Business Address:
Meadowlands Family Health Centre
888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa ON  K2C 3R2
Phone Number: (613) 228-2882

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Sep 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAMIM TAHERZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHERZADEH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2016