Tahiliani, Ravi (CPSO#: 74545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104A
300 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K1
Phone: (905) 245-0616
Fax: (905) 245-0618
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Canada
Phone: (905) 985-2895
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ravi Tahiliani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tahiliani ( CPSO# 74545 )

Business Address:
104A - 300 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K1
Phone Number: (905) 245-0616

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAVI TAHILIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHILIANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 Mar 2000 to 02 Apr 2000
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Apr 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2002