Tahir, Fadwah Hamzah Abd Alhamid (CPSO#: 87788)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Aug 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 09 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 09 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Oct 2009