Tai, Derek Yue Hin (CPSO#: 87622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1807 Wonderland Rd N
London ON  N6G5C2
Phone: (519) 433-4330
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2022 Kains Road
London ON  N6K0A8
Canada
Phone: 5194322648
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek Tai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tai ( CPSO# 87622 )

Business Address:
2022 Kains Road
London ON  N6K 4P5
Phone Number: (519) 432-0507

Business Address:
813 Richmond Street
London ON  N6H 3H6
Phone Number: (519) 433-4330

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK YUE HIN TAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Aug 2007 to 20 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Aug 2008 to 20 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Aug 2009 to 31 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2010 to 31 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2012