Tai, Patricia Tak Hing (CPSO#: 65791)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Allan Blair Cancer Centre
4101 Dewdney Avenue
Regina SK  S4T 7T1
Phone: (306) 766-2206
Fax: (306) 766-2845

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA TAK HING TAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 13 Jul 1992 to 02 Oct 1992
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Oct 1998
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 May 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1999