Tai Pow, John Malcolm (CPSO#: 54090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Rd.
Scarborough, ON M1W 3W3
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2561
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Ave. E
Scarborough, ON M1P 2V5
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 439-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tai-Pow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tai Pow ( CPSO# 54090 )
Dr. L. Chong ( CPSO# 54206 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Scarborough Grace Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2561

Business Address:
175 - 4600 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 856-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MALCOLM TAI POW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAI POW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1985