Tai, Sharon Christina (CPSO#: 54014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 7, 76 Main Street West
Grimsby ON  L3M 1R6
Phone: (289) 235-8024
Fax: 9059452019
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Tai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tai ( CPSO# 54014 )

Business Address:
7 - 76 Main Street West
Grimsby ON  L3M 1R6
Phone Number: (289) 235-8024

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 02 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 31 Jul 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON CHRISTINA TAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1985