Tailor, Adarsh (CPSO#: 77505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3rd Floor
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 8Y2
Phone: (705) 721-0370
Fax: (705) 797-2033
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Tailor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tailor ( CPSO# 77505 )

Business Address:
370 Bayview Drive
3rd Floor
Barrie ON  L4N 8Y2
Phone Number: (705) 721-0370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 10 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADARSH TAILOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAILOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2008 to 22 Jan 2008
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2008