Tailor, Chetna (CPSO#: 80880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4100 Strandherd Drive
Suite #208
Nepean ON  K2J 0V2
Phone: (613) 505-9704
Fax: (613) 505-9707
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tailor Lodha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Lodha ( CPSO# 76513 )
Dr. C. Tailor ( CPSO# 80880 )

Business Address:
The Royal Ottawa Hospital
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Business Address:
LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
208 - 4100 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa ON  K2V 0V2
Phone Number: (613) 505-9704

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHETNA TAILOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAILOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 02 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2010