Tait, Heather Mary (CPSO#: 78156)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: McMulkin, Heather Mary (used until: 13 Aug 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2003