Tajirian, Tania (CPSO#: 79200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Armenian, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
1001 Queen Street West
Unit 1-1
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 30515
Fax: (416) 583-1373
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tania Tajirian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tajirian ( CPSO# 79200 )

Business Address:
CAMH
1001 Queen Street West
Unit 1-1
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANIA TAJIRIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAJIRIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2004 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2005