Tak, Farzana Yousuf (CPSO#: 83790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3640 Wells st
windsor on
N9C1T9
Windsor ON  N9C 4H4
Phone: (519)258 0484
Fax: 519 258 0488
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Maryvale
3640 Wells Street
Windsor ON  N9C 1T9
Canada
Phone: 5192580484
Fax: 5192580488
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Tak ( CPSO# 83790 )

Business Address:
Maryvale
3640 Wells Street
Windsor ON  N9C 1T9
Phone Number: (519) 258-0484

Business Address:
3901 Connaught Street
Windsor ON  N9C 4H4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5215

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan
USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Oct 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARZANA YOUSUF TAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Jan 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010