Takach Lapner, Sarah Louise Dunbar (CPSO#: 84741)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Names: Lapner, Sarah Louise Dunbar Takach (used until: 15 Jun 2012 )     Takach, Sarah Louise Dunbar (used until: 25 Nov 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 28 Feb 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015