Takacs, Jennifer May Linda (CPSO#: 83072)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Downs Family Practice
425 University Avenue East, Unit O
Waterloo ON  N2K 4C9
Phone: (519) 569-8821
Fax: (519) 569-8823
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MAY LINDA TAKACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKACS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008