Takahashi, Ken (CPSO#: 82030)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Shinshu University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2004 to 16 Dec 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 12 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Aug 2005