Takeuchi, Hiroyoshi (CPSO#: 99558)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Chiba Medical University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Japan

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2012 to 15 Jan 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2017