Takeuchi, Lawrence (CPSO#: 60649)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Takeuchi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2014